RI H6397 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the department of environmental management to remove freshwater non-native and invasive aquatic plants and assist municipalities in preventing the growth and spread of these and other invasive species in the freshwater lakes and ponds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection Of Trees And Plants Generally

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-06-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2023)
2023-05-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback