RI H6378 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the time of the city of Woonsocket's first statistical update following the 2017 revaluation would be extended from 2020 to 2021 and be based on the valuations as of December 31, 2021.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |
2021-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee heard and continued |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-05-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |