RI H6377 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for a summary of a mammography report be provided to the patient by mail, electronically or otherwise with abnormal result provided only upon approval by the referring provider.
Title
Breast Cancer Patient Notification
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2021) |
2021-06-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |