RI H6374 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the commencement of substantial construction activities date, completion date or placed in service date, to December 31, 2026 and no project shall be deemed idle between March 9, 2020 and December 31, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historic Preservation Tax Credits 2013

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2023)
2023-05-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback