RI H6344 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires driver education programs to teach applicants prohibitions/obligations relating to traffic stops and procedure for filing complaint for any violations.
Title
Comprehensive Community -- Police Relationship Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6344.pdf |