RI H6333 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Reinstating The Life And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Purchase And Use Of Textbooks In Public Schools
Title
Joint Resolution Reinstating The Life And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Purchase And Use Of Textbooks In Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | House read and passed |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-07-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6333.pdf |