RI H6330 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates temporary non-liquidating receivership program for businesses with substantial revenue decline after declared emergency/suspended/ceased substantial part of operation resulting by emergency police/regulatory powers.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions -- Rhode Island Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6330.pdf |