RI H6327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises Rhode Island Medicaid primary care payment rates to not less than federal Medicare rates for the same service.
Title
Relating To State Affairs And Government – Office Of Health And Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6327.pdf |