RI H6325 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines a used part and create standards for use of used parts in physically damaged motor vehicles upon the insurance company and the automobile body shop.
Title
Motor Vehicle Replacement Parts
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6325.pdf |