RI H6317 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow The Honorable Regina M. Chu To Join Katherine L. Miller And Joshua Chu In Marriage On Or About September 21, 2013, Within The City Of Pawtucket, Rhode Island.)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow The Honorable Regina M. Chu To Join Katherine L. Miller And Joshua Chu In Marriage On Or About September 21, 2013, Within The City Of Pawtucket, Rhode Island.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House read and passed |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6317.pdf |