RI H6267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the reduction and elimination of the motor vehicle excise tax. Also provides that cities, towns, and fire districts would be reimbursed for the revenues lost by the reduction and elimination of the excise tax.
Title
Excise On Motor Vehicles And Trailers
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6267.pdf |