RI H6261 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $1,000,000 From The American Rescue Plan Act Funds To The Town Of Foster To Resolve Covid-inflated Costs Impacting Construction Addressing Public Safety, Building Code And Ada Compliance Issues With The Town's Police Station And Public Safety Complex (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $1,000,000 To The Town Of Foster For Relief In Combating Elevated Covid-related Construction Costs To The Town's Police Station And Public Safety Complex.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $1,000,000 From The American Rescue Plan Act Funds To The Town Of Foster To Resolve Covid-inflated Costs Impacting Construction Addressing Public Safety, Building Code And Ada Compliance Issues With The Town's Police Station And Public Safety Complex (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $1,000,000 To The Town Of Foster For Relief In Combating Elevated Covid-related Construction Costs To The Town's Police Station And Public Safety Complex.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-04-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/19/2023)
2023-04-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback