RI H6259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Prp, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Prp, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | House | House read and passed |