RI H6258 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all persons serving on boards and commissions appointed by the governor have a connection to the state through residence or licensure.
Title
Merit System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-06-21 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |