RI H6253 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires parking lots to designate parking spaces for electric vehicles/installation of charging stations for new existing public/private parking lots with fines for parking violations/compliance. Effective 7/1/21.
Title
Parking Facilities And Privileges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2021) |
2021-04-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6253.pdf |