RI H6252 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Creating Special House Legislative Commission To Study The Effects And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council (crmc) (creates A 15 Member Commission To Study The Effects And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By April 1, 2022, And Expire On May 15, 2022.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Creating Special House Legislative Commission To Study The Effects And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council (crmc) (creates A 15 Member Commission To Study The Effects And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By April 1, 2022, And Expire On May 15, 2022.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29HouseHouse read and passed
2021-06-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/29/2021)
2021-06-28HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-06-25HouseScheduled for consideration (06/28/2021)
2021-04-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-22HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2021)
2021-04-16HouseIntroduced, referred to House State Government & Elections

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback