RI H6251 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the administrator of the division of motor vehicles the power to extend the expiration dates up to ninety (90) days of permits, licenses, registrations, certificates, placards, and other privileges, under limited circumstances.
Title
Expiration Dates
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2017) |
2017-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |