RI H6246 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Lincoln to issue bonds and notes in an amount not exceeding $60,000,000 to finance the improvements to Lincoln High School and school facilities in the town.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Lincoln To Issue Bonds And Notes In An Amount Not Exceeding $60,000,000 To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Rehabilitation, Repair, Improvements, Furnishing And Equipping Of And/or Additions To Lincoln High School And School Facilities In The Town
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |