RI H6242 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Gregory A. Mancini, Esq., to join Semra Beric and James Silvia-Chandley in marriage on or about October 22, 2023, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-18 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-15HouseSigned by Governor
2023-05-09HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-05-09SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2023-05-05SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/09/2023)
2023-05-04SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2023-04-28SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2023)
2023-04-24SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2023-04-18HouseHouse read and passed
2023-04-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/18/2023)
2023-04-05HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-03-31HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023)
2023-03-30HouseIntroduced, referred to House Special Legislation

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback