RI H6242 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Deborah A. Connor to join Erin Mahoney and Michael Weis in marriage on or about June 10, 2017, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-23 | House | House read and passed |