RI H6237 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum amount to be recovered in civil court action as a small claims from two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500) to seven thousand dollars ($7,000).
Title
Small Claims And Consumer Claims -- Procedure In Particular Actions
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-04 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2021) |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |