RI H6230 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Daniel Joseph Lawlor Of Providence, Rhode Island, To Join Sara Melissa Orleck And Thomas Smith Chen In Marriage Within The Town Of Foster, Rhode Island, On Or About June 28, 2014.)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Daniel Joseph Lawlor Of Providence, Rhode Island, To Join Sara Melissa Orleck And Thomas Smith Chen In Marriage Within The Town Of Foster, Rhode Island, On Or About June 28, 2014.)
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Ferri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-20 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/20/2013) |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2013) |
2013-06-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6230.pdf |