RI H6228 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases from fourteen (14) days to twenty-one (21) days the time that licensed vendors of precious metals and articles have to hold them before they can be resold.
Title
Sale Of Used Precious Metals
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015) |
2015-05-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6228.pdf |