RI H6227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the mandated minimum number of prepaid orders deadline for the Rhode Island Law Enforcement Memorial Benefit Fund special license plates to January 1, 2022.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-06-27 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |