RI H6224 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals a provision of the workers' compensation law that provides that for injuries on and after July 1, 2023, "material hindrance" includes only compensable injuries causing a greater than sixty-five percent (65%) degree of functional impairment.
Title
Workers' Compensation--benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2017) |
2017-05-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-05-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |