RI H6223 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Elementary And Secondary Education To Annually Prepare A Written Report Or Annually Include And Update Information On The Ride Website Regarding School Funding For Each School District
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Elementary And Secondary Education To Annually Prepare A Written Report Or Annually Include And Update Information On The Ride Website Regarding School Funding For Each School District
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Alex Finkelman [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2023) |
2023-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6223.pdf |