RI H6219 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows labor organizations/unions to organize any employees who work for employers in an industry that is regulated by the medical marijuana act or cannabis-regulated industry.
Title
Right To Organize
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6219.pdf |