RI H6219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of "family member" for purposes of zoning ordinances.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |