RI H6218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Assents to the FDA Food Safety Modernization Act, and empowers the director of DEM to perform those acts necessary, to be in compliance with the provisions of the act for the modernization of the safety of the food supply.
Title
Assent To Food Safety Modernization Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |