RI H6215 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of sexual orientation. Allows cases in superior court. Allows mediation prior to superior court case. Prohibits court order unless attorney fee waiver is signed. Repeals exemptions to sexual discrimination.
Title
Rhode Island Fair Housing Practices Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2021) |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |