RI H6212 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes council to grant variances to any provisions of title 16 other than those in ยง16-60-4.2 and to any department of education and school district regulation not affecting the health/safety/civil rights of public school pupils.
Title
Board Of Regents For Elementary And Secondary Education
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6212.pdf |