RI H6210 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides patients opportunity to opt out of information disclosure under HIE.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Health Information Exchange Act Of 2008

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-12HouseSigned by Governor
2021-07-08HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-30SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021)
2021-06-22SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2021-06-18SenateScheduled for consideration (06/22/2021)
2021-06-17SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2021-06-16HouseHouse passed Sub A
2021-06-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/16/2021)
2021-06-10HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-04HouseProposed Substitute
2021-06-04HouseScheduled for consideration (06/10/2021)
2021-04-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021)
2021-04-07HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback