RI H6204 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that any altered roadway be restored to the same or better condition that existed prior to the alteration, immediately after the completion of the alteration, and further establishes a daily penalty for failure to comply.
Title
Maintenance Of Town Highways
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-05-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6204.pdf |