RI H6203 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Dr. Charles A. Steinberg to join Jaclyn Marie Dempsey and Brent Crawford Wilks in marriage on or about October 13, 2019, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |