RI H6202 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes persons seventy (70) years of age or older eligible for exemption from jury service.
Title
Procedure Generally - Jury Lists
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2017) |
2017-05-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6202.pdf |