RI H6195 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special House Commission To Study The Issue Of Sexual Assault On College Campuses In The State Of Rhode Island (creates An 11 Member Commission To Study Options To Eliminate The Occurrence Of Sexual Assaults On College Campuses In Our State, And Who Would Report Back By May 31, 2016, And Would Expire On June 30, 2016.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special House Commission To Study The Issue Of Sexual Assault On College Campuses In The State Of Rhode Island (creates An 11 Member Commission To Study Options To Eliminate The Occurrence Of Sexual Assaults On College Campuses In Our State, And Who Would Report Back By May 31, 2016, And Would Expire On June 30, 2016.)
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2015) |
2015-06-02 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2015) |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2015) |
2015-05-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |