RI H6193 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits individuals from completing alcohol-server training requirements from online or Internet sources.
Title
Relating To Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2017) |
2017-05-13 | House | Meeting postponed (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-05-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6193.pdf |