RI H6192 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows "Disabled Veterans" as defined in ยง 31-6-8 to apply for as many registration plates desired for vehicles they own.
Title
Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2021) |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6192.pdf |