RI H6179 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides all Medicare recipients over sixty-five (65) years of age applying for Medicare supplement plan guaranteed issue rights regardless of medical or health or receipt of health care by the applicant.
Title
Medicare Supplement Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/20/2023) |
2023-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |