RI H6173 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from sales and use taxes specialized packaging equipment such as kegs for alcoholic beverages.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes -- Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2017) |
2017-04-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6173.pdf |