RI H6172 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Waives costs of criminal background checks for employees of child day care, daycare centers, family daycare homes, group family daycare homes, child-placing agencies and residential childcare facilities that must be state licensed by DCYF.
Title
Certification Of Childcare And Youth-serving Workers And Operators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2021) |
2021-03-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6172.pdf |