RI H6171 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the public utilities commission to implement a purchase of receivables program where the electric distribution company purchases the receivables of a nonregulated power producer at a discount rate.
Title
Electric Generation Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2017) |
2017-04-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |