RI H6170 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates insurance coverage for medically necessary expenses for standard fertility preservation services when a medical treatment may directly or indirectly cause iatrogenic infertility.
Title
Relating To Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-04-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |