RI H6168 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts fire districts and entities with no tax or policy making authority from certain posting requirements of open meetings act.
Title
Open Meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-04-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6168.pdf |