RI H6167 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows The Honorable Raymond A. Hull to join Brenda Lee Rezendes and Thomas W. Carroll in marriage on or about June 25, 2017, within the City of Cranston, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-05-04 | House | House read and passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/04/2017) |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |