RI H6164 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the presiding justice of the superior court, to create a superior court diversion program.
Title
Superior Court
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-14 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |