RI H6155 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a statutory vehicle for the creation and functioning of workers' cooperatives which are corporations that are owned and democratically governed by their members.
Title
Workers' Cooperatives
Sponsors
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Workers' cooperatives approval of amendment (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2017-06-01 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |