RI H6143 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies Warwick Sewer Authority Act by expanding number of members; increasing number of votes for by-law changes; providing for as many as thirty year installment payments; relieves owners with functioning septic systems from assessments for 20 years.
Title
Sewer Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2019-06-12 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-04 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |