RI H6141 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Gives the department of labor and training the jurisdiction to review claims alleging that employers had improperly inquired about an applicant’s criminal history on an employment application.
Title
Employment Applications
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017) |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |