RI H6140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state to reimburse the city/town for any costs associated with transporting children placed in foster care by RI-licensed child-placing agency or RI governmental agency to an educational facility outside the regional transportation district.
Title
Residence Of Children For School Purposes
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2021) |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6140.pdf |